NY A02787 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that increased rates of payment for behavioral health services shall be deemed to be effective on the date of the law, rule or regulation under which the change or increase is required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that increased rates of payment for behavioral health services shall be deemed to be effective on the date of the law, rule or regulation under which the change or increase is required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1494
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3960
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.104
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.104
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-02-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03960 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2787

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02787&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02787&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02787
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02787&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02787&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02787&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02787&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2787#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback