NY A02799 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - print number 2799a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for coverage for certain medically necessary prescription drugs in Medicaid managed care programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for coverage for certain medically necessary prescription drugs in Medicaid managed care programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15Assemblyprint number 2799a
2019-02-15Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01794 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1794A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback