NY A02803 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "tenant" for the purposes of required notice during a mortgage foreclosure action.
Title
Expands the definition of "tenant" for the purposes of required notice during a mortgage foreclosure action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.222 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.192 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05655 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT