NY A02804 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the creation of micro-business worker cooperatives upon transfer of ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the creation of micro-business worker cooperatives upon transfer of ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.274
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1849
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6855A
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-18Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblyrepassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyamended on third reading 2804a
2018-06-13Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2018-06-13Senaterecalled from senate
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2018-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.223
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-09SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2017-05-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-09Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.273
2017-05-02Assemblyreported
2017-02-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-23Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S06855 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2804A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02804&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02804&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02804
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02804&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02804A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02804&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02804&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02804&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2804#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback