NY A02835 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the conducting of public hearings and reports thereon prior to the closure to public access of any real property by the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the conducting of public hearings and reports thereon prior to the closure to public access of any real property by the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.275
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1752
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3457A
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2018-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.228
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-15SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2017-05-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-08Assemblyamended on third reading 2835a
2017-04-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.193
2017-04-25Assemblyreported
2017-02-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-23Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S03457 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2835A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02835&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02835&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02835
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02835&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02835A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02835&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02835&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02835&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2835#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback