NY A02853 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Troy to impose hotel and motel taxes; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes the city of Troy to impose hotel and motel taxes; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.258 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.105 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a2853 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1484 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2622 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.105 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.105 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02622 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.258