NY A02857 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-12)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing pharmacy interns to administer immunizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing pharmacy interns to administer immunizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.359
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1422
2018-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1043D
2018-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-22Assemblyamended on third reading 2857d
2018-05-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.904
2018-05-14Assemblyreported
2018-02-21Assemblyprint number 2857c
2018-02-21Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2017-09-01Assemblyprint number 2857b
2017-09-01Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2017-06-02Assemblyprint number 2857a
2017-06-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2017-01-23Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S01043 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2857D

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02857
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02857A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02857B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02857C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02857D
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02857&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2857#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback