NY A02880 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.640
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.640
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits denial of coverage of additional or alternative services or procedures related to health care services for which pre-authorization was granted or did not require pre-authorization.
Title
Limits denial of coverage of additional or alternative services or procedures related to health care services for which pre-authorization was granted or did not require pre-authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.640 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.493 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a2880b |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1509 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5328A |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5328a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2880b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2880a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.493 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01394 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05328 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.640
S05328 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.640