NY A02946 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the small business crime prevention services program to provide small businesses with information on strategies, best practices and programs offering training and assistance in prevention of crimes in and around the premises of small businesses or otherwise affecting small businesses, including but not limited to: assault, arson and other violent felony offenses; robbery, burglary, theft, identity theft counterfeiting, check and credit card fraud and other fraud; and vandalism, graffiti and other property damage; further provides that information on eligibility and applications for financial assistance be made available to small businesses; authorizes the New York state urban development corporation to provide loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to small businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or other organizations for the purpose of preventing crimes against small businesses or on the premises or in the vicinity of small businesses; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the small business crime prevention services program to provide small businesses with information on strategies, best practices and programs offering training and assistance in prevention of crimes in and around the premises of small businesses or otherwise affecting small businesses, including but not limited to: assault, arson and other violent felony offenses; robbery, burglary, theft, identity theft counterfeiting, check and credit card fraud and other fraud; and vandalism, graffiti and other property damage; further provides that information on eligibility and applications for financial assistance be made available to small businesses; authorizes the New York state urban development corporation to provide loans, loan guarantees, interest subsidies and grants to small businesses, municipalities, not-for-profit corporations or other organizations for the purpose of preventing crimes against small businesses or on the premises or in the vicinity of small businesses; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.156 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.251 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a2946 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | referred to small business |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.178 |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s1087 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.251 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.251 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S01087 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.156
S07123 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to small business
S07123 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to small business