NY A02957 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires information on possible complications from pregnancy that can lead to death; requires screenings and referrals for serious threats to life after pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires information on possible complications from pregnancy that can lead to death; requires screenings and referrals for serious threats to life after pregnancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1770
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4637A
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.107
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.107
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-23Assemblyprint number 2957a
2019-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04637 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2957A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02957&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02957&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02957
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02957&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02957A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02957&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02957&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02957&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2957#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback