NY A02971 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the mandatory health insurance coverage under health insurance plans of cleft lip and cleft palate to include treatment of related conditions and illnesses.
Title
Relates to the mandatory health insurance coverage under health insurance plans of cleft lip and cleft palate to include treatment of related conditions and illnesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01965 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN