NY A02983 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - print number 2983b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - print number 2983b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Title
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | print number 2983b |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | print number 2983a |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02910 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2910C