NY A02983 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - amended on third reading 2983a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - amended on third reading 2983a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain prohibitions in contracts or agreements by health maintenance organizations; prohibits clauses which entitle reimbursement at the lowest price or rate; prohibits contracts which restrict referral of patients based solely upon a health care provider's status with a managed care product; prohibits disclosure of an enrollee's diagnosis on a prescription as a condition for authorizing coverage for payment or dispensing of a prescription; and prohibits contracts which allow for the substitution of a pharmaceutical drug or agent by any person other than the prescribing health care professional.
Title
Relates to certain prohibitions in contracts or agreements by health maintenance organizations; prohibits clauses which entitle reimbursement at the lowest price or rate; prohibits contracts which restrict referral of patients based solely upon a health care provider's status with a managed care product; prohibits disclosure of an enrollee's diagnosis on a prescription as a condition for authorizing coverage for payment or dispensing of a prescription; and prohibits contracts which allow for the substitution of a pharmaceutical drug or agent by any person other than the prescribing health care professional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2983a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.124 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.286 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06858 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH