NY A02998 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes expedited partner therapy for certain sexually transmitted infections.
Title
Authorizes expedited partner therapy for certain sexually transmitted infections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.298 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-25 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.107 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | substituted for a2998 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.192 |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | substituted by s1799 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.107 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01799 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.298