NY A03002 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - signed chap.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each industrial development agency to live stream and post video recordings of all open meetings and public hearings; requires each industrial development agency to post such recordings for a period of not less than five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each industrial development agency to live stream and post video recordings of all open meetings and public hearings; requires each industrial development agency to post such recordings for a period of not less than five years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-27Senatesigned chap.185
2019-08-23Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-04-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-09Senate3RD READING CAL.26
2019-04-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S88
2019-03-27SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-03-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-27Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.74
2019-02-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S00088 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3002

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback