NY A03018 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits elected officials and persons in a leadership position of a party committee from receiving compensation for legal fees, consulting, or other work performed for an industrial development agency or an economic assistance corporation.
Title
Prohibits elected officials and persons in a leadership position of a party committee from receiving compensation for legal fees, consulting, or other work performed for an industrial development agency or an economic assistance corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 3018b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | print number 3018a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00097 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE