NY A03043 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2019-05-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.235
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S04463 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback