NY A03050 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies procedures for the closure and/or decertification of assisted living residences; requires written notice and department approval and shall include timetables.
Title
Specifies procedures for the closure and/or decertification of assisted living residences; requires written notice and department approval and shall include timetables.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.126 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3050a |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.133 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04609 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING