NY A03058 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to burglary in the second degree; adds language where the building is a dwelling which, at the time of the commission of the crime, is occupied by a person who is not a participant in the crime to what constitutes burglary in the second degree.
Title
Relates to burglary in the second degree; adds language where the building is a dwelling which, at the time of the commission of the crime, is occupied by a person who is not a participant in the crime to what constitutes burglary in the second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.127 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.108 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02177 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES