NY A03076 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications of members of the gaming commission.
Title
Relates to the qualifications of members of the gaming commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Senate | signed chap.308 |
2018-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1751 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3370 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.779 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2017-01-26 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S03370 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3076