NY A03086 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 3086a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 3086a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mandatory health insurance coverage for providing prosthetic devices.
Title
Relates to mandatory health insurance coverage for providing prosthetic devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | print number 3086a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07373 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE