NY A03088 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases limitation on highway expenses in the town of Brookhaven, Suffolk county, from one million dollars to two million six hundred thousand dollars.
Title
Increases limitation on highway expenses in the town of Brookhaven, Suffolk county, from one million dollars to two million six hundred thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.128 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.128 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | print number 3088a |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02855 (Same As) 2020-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2855A