NY A03110 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - print number 3110a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - print number 3110a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Standardizes child care copayments by instructing local social services districts to not require a family receiving child care assistance to contribute more than 20% of the amount of their income exceeding the poverty level.
Title
Standardizes child care copayments by instructing local social services districts to not require a family receiving child care assistance to contribute more than 20% of the amount of their income exceeding the poverty level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | print number 3110a |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01546 (Same As) 2020-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 1546A