NY A03122 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that signs posted for highway work zone traffic control, including but not limited to highway construction zones, maintenance work areas, or restricted highways, be promptly covered or removed whenever such sign or signs are not applicable.
Title
Requires that signs posted for highway work zone traffic control, including but not limited to highway construction zones, maintenance work areas, or restricted highways, be promptly covered or removed whenever such sign or signs are not applicable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.131 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.396 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05986 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES