NY A03148 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - substituted by s4060
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06Assemblysubstituted by s4060
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.236
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-21Assemblyprint number 3148a
2019-03-21Assemblyamend and recommit to aging
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S04060 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback