NY A03162 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of human rights to develop an anti-bias and inclusion training; requires certain public employees and private contractors to complete such training bi-annually.
Title
Requires the division of human rights to develop an anti-bias and inclusion training; requires certain public employees and private contractors to complete such training bi-annually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 3162b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 3162a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00215 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR