NY A03164 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to be part of county-wide shared services panels.
Title
Requires school districts to be part of county-wide shared services panels.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] |
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in local governments |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07605 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT