NY A03196 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Limits the use of messages of necessity to situations involving a state of emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the use of messages of necessity to situations involving a state of emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-01-30Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01249 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback