NY A03200 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residency requirement for the court attendant for the town of Somers in the county of Westchester.
Title
Relates to the residency requirement for the court attendant for the town of Somers in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.466 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.111 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a3200 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.381 |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s3409 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.111 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.111 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03409 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.466