NY A03214 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to immunity from civil liability and information furnished to or from the National Insurance Crime Bureau, which is dedicated to the investigation and prosecution of the banking law or the insurance law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to immunity from civil liability and information furnished to or from the National Insurance Crime Bureau, which is dedicated to the investigation and prosecution of the banking law or the insurance law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06Senate3RD READING CAL.248
2019-05-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3505A
2019-05-06SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2019-05-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.237
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-08Assemblyprint number 3214a
2019-04-08Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-02-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S03505 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3214A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03214&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03214&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03214
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03214&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03214A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03214&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03214&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3214#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03214&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback