NY A03254 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts a bill of rights for owners of residential condominium units to provide fair and equitable treatment of all unit owners; directs the attorney general to promulgate a handbook summary of the rights of unit owners vis-a-vis condominium associations and the procedures and processes available to unit owners to enforce such rights.
Title
Enacts a bill of rights for owners of residential condominium units to provide fair and equitable treatment of all unit owners; directs the attorney general to promulgate a handbook summary of the rights of unit owners vis-a-vis condominium associations and the procedures and processes available to unit owners to enforce such rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 3254a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to housing |