NY A03276 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - signed chap.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - signed chap.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes state and New York city maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Title
Establishes state and New York city maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.140 |
2019-07-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.224 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1819 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.64 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01819 (Same As) 2019-08-01 - signed chap.140