NY A03309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - print number 3309a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - print number 3309a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to the conservation easement tax credit.
Title
Makes technical corrections to the conservation easement tax credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Assembly | print number 3309a |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01695 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - PRINT NUMBER 1695A