NY A03322 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s2717
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s2717
Summary
To authorize the Racing and Wagering Board (Board), upon a finding based on a reasonable basis that an off-track betting corporation (OTB) is not complying with the law, to order an OTB to cause its business and managerial practices to be audited. It also requires that OTB corporations submit copies of the corporation's annual budget to the Board no later than 20 days after approval by the corporation's board of directors.
Title
An act to amend the racing, pari-mutuel wagering and breeding law, in relation to audits and budgets of off-track betting corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | substituted by s2717 | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.260 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.118 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.118 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-01-26 | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S2717 (Same As) 2010-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.459
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03322&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |