NY A03330 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a real property tax exemption task force.
Title
Establishes a real property tax exemption task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.27 |
2020-12-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2020-11-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a3330a |
2020-02-11 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.274 |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3679A |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s3679a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.298 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | print number 3330a |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03679 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.27