NY A03337 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - advanced to third reading cal.76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires disclosure of possible conflicts; provides for the vacating of an arbitration award on the ground that the arbitrator was affiliated in any way with any party, or has a financial interest directly or indirectly in any party or in the outcome of the arbitration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires disclosure of possible conflicts; provides for the vacating of an arbitration award on the ground that the arbitrator was affiliated in any way with any party, or has a financial interest directly or indirectly in any party or in the outcome of the arbitration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.76
2019-02-27Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S05669 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback