NY A03339 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Title
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.166 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.207 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | print number 3339a |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |