NY A03340 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - print number 3340a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - print number 3340a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to decisions by the state board on electric generation; requires approval through public referendum prior to certification for establishing a major electric generating facility.
Title
Relates to decisions by the state board on electric generation; requires approval through public referendum prior to certification for establishing a major electric generating facility.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | print number 3340a |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06857 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS