NY A03345 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that with respect to leases on motor vehicles, no lease shall provide that the lessee would be charged a turn-in fee at the expiration of the term which constitutes solely an additional fee for administrative, handling or clerical charges.
Title
Provides that with respect to leases on motor vehicles, no lease shall provide that the lessee would be charged a turn-in fee at the expiration of the term which constitutes solely an additional fee for administrative, handling or clerical charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.138 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.238 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05921 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION