NY A03349 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons or business entities from filing unnecessary personal identifying information with an agency; provides for enforcement by the attorney general.
Title
Prohibits persons or business entities from filing unnecessary personal identifying information with an agency; provides for enforcement by the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.139 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.239 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02121 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION