NY A03358 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination based on gender identity or expression; defines "gender identity or expression" as having or being perceived as having a gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression whether or not that gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression is different from that traditionally associated with the sex assigned to that person at birth; further includes offenses regarding gender identity or expression within the list of offenses subject to treatment as hate crimes.
Title
Prohibits discrimination based on gender identity or expression; defines "gender identity or expression" as having or being perceived as having a gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression whether or not that gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression is different from that traditionally associated with the sex assigned to that person at birth; further includes offenses regarding gender identity or expression within the list of offenses subject to treatment as hate crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.265 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.121 |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00502 (Same As) 2017-04-25 - DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07010 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07010 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS