NY A03361 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - advanced to third reading cal.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - advanced to third reading cal.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state drinking water bill of rights.
Title
Enacts the New York state drinking water bill of rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.472 |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | print number 3361a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05334 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5334A