NY A03366 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to publish on the department of motor vehicle's website information to assist persons in determining whether a safety recall has been issued on motor vehicles and related equipment, child safety seats or tires.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to publish on the department of motor vehicle's website information to assist persons in determining whether a safety recall has been issued on motor vehicles and related equipment, child safety seats or tires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04Senatesigned chap.338
2019-10-01Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1366
2019-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6243
2019-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.399
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 3366a
2019-05-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06243 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3366A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03366&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03366&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03366
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03366&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03366A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03366&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03366&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3366#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback