NY A03371 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain defenses to parking violations despite entering of a default judgment.
Title
Allows certain defenses to parking violations despite entering of a default judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | print number 3371a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |