NY A03385 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE
Pending: Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE
Pending: Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public officers and public bodies to make reasonable efforts to provide qualified interpreters at no charge for the hearing impaired at public meetings and hearings upon written request to the public officer responsible for the siting of such hearing; also requires installation and use of assistive listening devices.
Title
Requires public officers and public bodies to make reasonable efforts to provide qualified interpreters at no charge for the hearing impaired at public meetings and hearings upon written request to the public officer responsible for the siting of such hearing; also requires installation and use of assistive listening devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.140 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.400 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | print number 3385a |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02774 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2774C