NY A03420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - print number 3420a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to pre-clearance of voting-related regulations and policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to pre-clearance of voting-related regulations and policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17Assemblyprint number 3420a
2019-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S04032 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback