NY A03421 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state financial literacy commission; creates a state financial literacy commission to measurably improve the financial literacy and financial capability of New York state residents.
Title
Establishes the state financial literacy commission; creates a state financial literacy commission to measurably improve the financial literacy and financial capability of New York state residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S01589 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES