NY A03425 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - signed chap.116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - signed chap.116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the scope of unlawful discriminatory practices to include public educational institutions.
Title
Relates to expanding the scope of unlawful discriminatory practices to include public educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.116 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.364 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4901 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.30 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.30 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04901 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY