NY A03457 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Gender Recognition Act"; repeals certain provisions of the vehicle and traffic law relating to driver's licenses.
Title
Enacts the "Gender Recognition Act"; repeals certain provisions of the vehicle and traffic law relating to driver's licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 3457b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | print number 3457a |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00056 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES