NY A03471 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s1639a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s1639a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boating safety certificates of all persons operating a mechanically propelled vessel.
Title
Requires boating safety certificates of all persons operating a mechanically propelled vessel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s1639a |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3471a |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.252 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-25 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S01639 (Same As) 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.361